Ha, Andrew Chun Tung (CPSO#: 77634)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peter Munk Cardiac Center
Toronto General Hospital
University Health Network
200 Elizabeth Street 3GW-558A
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-5206
Fax: (416) 340-3340
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew C. T. Ha Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 04 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ha ( CPSO# 77634 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
UHN - Peter Munk Cardiac Centre
200 Elizabeth Street
3GW-558A
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-5206

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 19 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW CHUN TUNG HA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Sep 2010
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 2008