Ha, Valerie (CPSO#: 74738)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2401 Yonge Street, Suite 202
Toronto ON  M4P 3H1
Phone: 416-322-3700
Fax: 416-322-3707
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Aug 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VALERIE HA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Aug 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2001 to 31 Aug 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2002