Haas, Yvonne Maria (CPSO#: 66486)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Oct 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 306
27 Roncesvalles Avenue
Toronto ON  M6R 3B2
Phone: (416) 761-0133
Fax: (416) 761-1915
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YVONNE MARIA HAAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAAS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1995 to 31 Oct 1995
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 1995