Haasbeek, Jeffrey Frank (CPSO#: 65369)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jul 1994