Haase, Erika (CPSO#: 85516)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:McGill University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Surgical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Surgical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jul 2008