Habal, Flavio (CPSO#: 31058)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 1979

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-5023
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Flavio Habal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Habal ( CPSO# 31058 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Room 9N977
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-5023

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Gastroenterology Effective: 07 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FLAVIO HABAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HABAL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1979