Habbab, Louay Mohd A (CPSO#: 97523)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 2012

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
Division of Cardiac Surgery
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 44453
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saudi Arabia

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LOUAY MOHD A HABBAB shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. HABBAB is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. HABBAB shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. HABBAB is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. HABBAB shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. HABBAB is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. HABBAB no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jun 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PEAP - Resident - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018