Habdank-Kossowski, Krzysztof (CPSO#: 79195)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: Habdank, Krzysztof (used until: 17 Jun 2008 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Queen's University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Welland County General Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Phone: (905) 732-6111 Ext. 33271
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Habdank-Kossowski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 02 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Habdank-Kossowski ( CPSO# 79195 )
Dr. K. Habdank-Kossowski ( CPSO# 79187 )

Business Address:
Welland General Hospital
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6

Business Address:
Greater Niagara General Hospital
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2

Business Address:
Port Colborne Hospital
260 Sugarloaf Street
Port Colborne ON  L3K 2N7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System Port Colborne General Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRZYSZTOF HABDANK-KOSSOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HABDANK-KOSSOWSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008