Habeeb, Ali Mohammed (CPSO#: 102719)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 10 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Babylon, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 31 Mar 2014 to 16 Jun 2014
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Mar 2016
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Sep 2016
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2016 to 31 Mar 2017
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - General Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 10 Jul 2017
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Jul 2017