Habermehl, Lisa Marie (CPSO#: 74697)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Sep 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
51 K Highway 105
PO Box 311
Red Lake ON  P0V 2M0
Phone: (807) 727-2617
Fax: (866) 665-1639
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lisa Marie Habermehl Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Habermehl ( CPSO# 74697 )

Business Address:
5 - 45 Wolsley Street
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone Number: (807) 468-8566

Business Address:
51 G Highway 105
Red Lake ON  P0V 2M0

Medical Records Location

Address: The Sunset Country Family Health Team 1 - 35 Wolsley St Kenora, ON P9N 0H8 Phone: 807-468-6321 Fax: 807-468-3978
Instructions: Patients who saw Dr Habermehl at the Woodlands Medical Associates clinic in Kenora, ON should request a copy of their medical record at the address above.
Date Received: 15 Jun 2018

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital Red Lake
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Sep 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA MARIE HABERMEHL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HABERMEHL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 22 Sep 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2002