Habib, Emad Ayyad (CPSO#: 69682)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: Habib Kellada, Emad Ayyad (used until: 29 Jul 2002 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Asyut University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Regional Cancer Centre
503 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 1C4
Phone: (613) 737-7700 Ext. 8469
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

368 Slater Street
Ottawa ON  K1R 5C1
Canada
Phone: (613) 236-9441
Fax: (613) 236-9425
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Appletree Medical Centre
2150 Robertson Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 9S1
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

appletree medical group
1595 merival clinic
Ottawa ON  K2G 3J4
Canada
Phone: 613 224 2880
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Emad Habib Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Habib ( CPSO# 69682 )

Business Address:
368 Slater Street
Ottawa ON  K1R 5C1
Phone Number: (613) 608-8451

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EMAD AYYAD HABIB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HABIB is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Sep 1996
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Sep 1998
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2002