Habib, Laura Anne Louise (CPSO#: 105550)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Hematology
190 Elizabeth Street
R Fraser Building 3 805
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURA ANNE LOUISE HABIB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HABIB is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 06 Apr 2015 to 03 May 2015
Elective Trainee - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 May 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017