Habib, Mohammad Ahsan (CPSO#: 89169)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Nishtar Medical College, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Psychiatry BURR4
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 12 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD AHSAN HABIB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HABIB is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 23 Sep 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2014