Habib, Zakaria Sobhy Suliman (CPSO#: 74597)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 18 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Mar 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 18 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Jun 2001