Habteselassie, Biruk Yitbarek (CPSO#: 83910)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Mar 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Dec 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Amharic, English

Education:Addis Ababa University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9-6400 Millcreek Drive
Mississauga ON  L5N 3E7
Phone: (905) 288-1045
Fax: 905 858-0111
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite #425
1200 Markham Rd
Scarborough ON  M1H 2Y9
Canada
Phone: (416) 438-7080
Fax: 416.438.7072
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

17215 Leslie Street, Unit A
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8E4
Canada
Phone: (905) 853-0404
Fax: 9052355698
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Biruk Habteselassie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 14 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Habteselassie ( CPSO# 83910 )

Business Address:
425 - 1200 Markham Road
Scarborough ON  M1H 3C3
Phone Number: (416) 438-7080

Business Address:
10660 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3C9
Phone Number: (905) 237-9096

Business Address:
9 - 6400 Millcreek Drive
Mississauga ON  L5N 3E7
Phone Number: (905) 288-1045

Business Address:
A - 17215 Leslie Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8E4
Phone Number: (905) 853-0404

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BIRUK YITBAREK HABTESELASSIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HABTESELASSIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 25 Mar 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 30 Apr 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Mar 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2007