Hackam, Daniel Gidon (CPSO#: 74993)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Mar 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
SPARC Unit Room 100K
1400 Western Road
London ON  N6G 2V2
Phone: 519-531-5731
Fax: 519-931-5737
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hackam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Hackam ( CPSO# 74993 )

Business Address:
1400 Western Road
London ON  N6G 2V2
Phone Number: (519) 663-3838

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL GIDON HACKAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HACKAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 14 Oct 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 15 Oct 2001 to 14 Oct 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 15 Oct 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2007