Hacker, Paul Lorne (CPSO#: 60805)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1861 Robertson Road
Suite 320
Ottawa ON  K2H 1B9
Phone: (613) 801-0035 Ext. 104
Fax: (613) 801-0036
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL LORNE HACKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HACKER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990