Hacker, Paul Michael (CPSO#: 56774)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Cardiology Assc
Suite 205
110 Copper Creek Drive
Markham ON  L6B 0P9
Phone: (905) 472-8228
Fax: (905) 472-8548
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

My Health
Stouffville Nuclear and Cardiac Ima
28 Sandiford DriveUnit 3
Stouffville ON  L4A 7X5
Canada
Phone: (905) 640-7100
Fax: (905) 640-7161
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul M. Hacker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Hacker ( CPSO# 56774 )

Business Address:
Markham Soutffville Cardiology Assc
Suite 205
110 Copper Creek Drive
Markham ON  L6B 0P9
Phone Number: (905) 472-8228

Business Address:
Stouffville Nuclear and Cardiac Imaging
28 Sandiford Drive
Unit 3
Stouffville ON  L4A 7X5
Phone Number: (905) 640-7100


Corporation Name: Hacker Minkowitz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 07 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Minkowitz ( CPSO# 55932 )
Dr. P. Hacker ( CPSO# 56774 )

Business Address:
Suite 205
110 Copper Creek Drive
Markham ON  L6B 0P9
Phone Number: (905) 472-9200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 26 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL MICHAEL HACKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HACKER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1987