Hackett, Robert Andrew (CPSO#: 26590)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jun 1974

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1974

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
box 940
1952 Blairhampton Road
Minden Ontario
K0M2K0
Minden ON  K0M2K0
Phone: (705) 2866994
Electoral District: 06

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - North Carolina

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Englehart and District Hospital Englehart
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services Hamilton
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1975 CFPC Specialist
Psychiatry Effective: 08 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT ANDREW HACKETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HACKETT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Sep 1991 to 31 Aug 1992
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Sep 1992 to 31 Aug 1993
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Sep 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Aug 1994
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Sep 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1974