Hacking, Jennifer Jane (CPSO#: 73540)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Mar 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Greenwood Medical Centre
Unit 10
496 Discovery Avenue
Kingston ON  K7K 7E9
Phone: (613) 507-7003
Fax: (613) 507-7006
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

K-town Physiotherapy
368 King St. East
Kingston ON  K7K 2Y2
Canada
Phone: (613) 876-0616
Fax: (613) 542-8646
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jennifer Hacking Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 25 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hacking ( CPSO# 73540 )

Business Address:
Greenwood Medical Centre
Unit 10
496 Discovery Avenue
Kingston ON  K7K 7E9
Phone Number: (613) 507-7003

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER JANE HACKING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HACKING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 07 Apr 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2002