Hadcock, Steven John (CPSO#: 69096)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
160 Dundurn Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 4K3
Phone: (905) 528-5480
Fax: (905) 528-2884
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hadcock Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hadcock ( CPSO# 69096 )

Business Address:
160 Dundurn Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 4K3
Phone Number: (905) 528-5480

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVEN JOHN HADCOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HADCOCK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1997