Haddad, Margaret Mary-Anne (CPSO#: 54096)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 May 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Albany Medical Clinic
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 2P8
Phone: (416) 461-9471
Fax: (416) 461-2710
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2010


Corporation Name: Dr. M. Haddad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 30 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Haddad ( CPSO# 54096 )

Business Address:
Albany Medical Clinic
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 2P8
Phone Number: (416) 461-9471

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARGARET MARY-ANNE HADDAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HADDAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 May 1987