Haddad, Michel (CPSO#: 73689)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of ICU
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone: (519) 464-4400 Ext. 4534
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Department of ICU
Windsor Regional Hospital
Oullette Campus
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Canada
Phone: (519) 973-4407
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Critical Care Unit
Thunder Bay Regional Hospital
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Canada
Phone: (807) 684-6366
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michel Haddad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 14 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Haddad ( CPSO# 73689 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6366

Business Address:
Hotel-Dieu Grace Hospital
Department of ICU
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4407

Business Address:
Bluewater Health
Department of ICU
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 464-4400

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Maryland
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 19 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHEL HADDAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HADDAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005