Hader, Walter John (CPSO#: 17224)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 May 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 May 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 16 Nov 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1959
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Sep 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jul 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 1995
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1996