Hadi, Ghassan Mohammed (CPSO#: 83767)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Oct 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Oct 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Al-Mustansiriyah, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 03 Oct 2005 to 28 Oct 2005
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2005 to 30 Nov 2005
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Oct 2005