Hadi, Ibrahim Abbas (CPSO#: 74540)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 May 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 18 Feb 2000 to 17 Feb 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 18 Feb 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 28 Feb 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 28 Feb 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2003 to 29 Feb 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2004 to 28 Feb 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2005 to 28 Feb 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2006 to 30 Sep 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Feb 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2006