Hadi, Maha (CPSO#: 79957)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, German, Persian

Education:Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Health Clinic
2555 Erin mills blv
Mississauga ON  L5M 5H1
Phone: (905) 8280270
Fax: (905)8280270
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mustafa Warsi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 15 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hadi ( CPSO# 79957 )
Dr. M. Warsi ( CPSO# 81143 )

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571


Corporation Name: Dr. Maha Hadi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 22 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hadi ( CPSO# 79957 )
Dr. M. Warsi ( CPSO# 81143 )

Business Address:
374 Lakeshore Road East
Mississauga ON  L5G 1H5
Phone Number: (905) 271-9000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 31 Jul 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAHA HADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HADI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 07 Jul 2003 to 31 Jul 2003
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2003 to 10 Aug 2003
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2003