Hadipour Jahromi, Mana (CPSO#: 103444)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 204
40 Shellington Place
Brantford ON  N3S 0C5
Phone: (519) 759-6116
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Hadipour Jahromi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hadipour Jahromi ( CPSO# 103444)

Business Address:
204 - 40 Shellington Place
Brantford ON  N3S 0C5
Phone Number: (519) 759-6116

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MANA HADIPOUR JAHROMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HADIPOUR JAHROMI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2016