Hadjiyannakis, Anastasia (CPSO#: 70119)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Aug 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 260-1477
Fax: (613) 738-4236
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 05 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANASTASIA HADJIYANNAKIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HADJIYANNAKIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2001