Hadziomerovic, Adnan (CPSO#: 66810)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bosnian, English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
Department of Medical Imaging
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 16688
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hadziomerovic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hadziomerovic ( CPSO# 66810 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Department of Radiology
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 744-1241

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 744-1241

Business Address:
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 744-1241

Business Address:
499 Raglan Street
Ottawa ON  K7V 1P6
Phone Number: (613) 744-1241

Business Address:
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone Number: (613) 744-1241

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADNAN HADZIOMEROVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HADZIOMEROVIC is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998