Haensel, Heidi Marie (CPSO#: 79312)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Zone B 8th Floor Room B8-158
800 Commisioners Rd E
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 76673
Fax: (519) 667-6514
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H.M. Haensel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Haensel ( CPSO# 79312 )

Business Address:
CAMHCP-Outpatients
800 Commissioners Road East
Room B8-158
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEIDI MARIE HAENSEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAENSEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009