Hafez, Shahira Osman (CPSO#: 32040)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:Ain Shams University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shahira Hafez Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 02 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hafez ( CPSO# 32040 )

Business Address:
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Phone Number: (416) 521-4011

Medical Records Location

Address: Trillium Health Centre 150 Sherway Dr Toronto, ON M9C 1A5 Phone: 905-848-7533
Date Received: 28 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 24 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018