Hafezi Bakhtiari, Sara (CPSO#: 83319)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Isfahan University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anatomical Pathology
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 4551
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1 hospital crourt
Oshawa ON  L1G2B9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARA HAFEZI BAKHTIARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAFEZI BAKHTIARI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010