Haffner, Thomas Drew (CPSO#: 88338)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 107
444 Douro Street
Stratford ON  N5A 0E6
Phone: (519) 273-0100
Fax: (519) 273-0675
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thomas D. Haffner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Haffner ( CPSO# 88338 )

Business Address:
444 Douro Street
Suite 107
Stratford ON  N5A 0E6
Phone Number: (519) 273-1990

Business Address:
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone Number: (519) 272-8201

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS DREW HAFFNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAFFNER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012