Hafiz, Shujauddin Fazalurrahman (CPSO#: 60269)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Mar 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Mar 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Karnatak University Dharwar, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2227 South Millway
Suite 301
Mississauga ON  L5L 3R6
Phone: (905) 569-9798
Fax: (905) 569-8630
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Hafiz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 09 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hafiz ( CPSO# 60269 )

Business Address:
Suite 301
2227 South Millway
Mississauga ON  L5L 3R6
Phone Number: (905) 569-9798

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 03 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHUJAUDDIN FAZALURRAHMAN HAFIZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAFIZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 1995