Hafuth, Falih Mohammad (CPSO#: 64548)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Sep 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Sep 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Mosul, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone: (519) 837-6440
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

51 Benton St.
Kitchener ON  N2G 3H1
Canada
Phone: 226-240-3015
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F. Hafuth Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 17 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Hafuth ( CPSO# 64548 )

Business Address:
51 Benton Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 3H1
Phone Number: (226) 240-3014

Business Address:
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 837-6440

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FALIH MOHAMMAD HAFUTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAFUTH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 1999