Hagen, Catherine Ann (CPSO#: 58697)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 2003 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jun 1999