Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Hagen, Paul Kenneth (CPSO#: 68810)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul K. Hagen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 18 2011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013