Haggarty, John Bruce (CPSO#: 57235)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Nov 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Manatee Memorial Hospital
Emergency Dept
206 Second St East
Bradenton FL  34208
United States
Phone: (941) 746-5111

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida
USA - New Hampshire

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN BRUCE HAGGARTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAGGARTY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1986 to 14 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Sep 1988
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 1987