Haggith, Yevgeniya (CPSO#: 95517)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian, Spanish

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
30 Prospect St.
Suite 302
Newmarket ON  L3Y 3S9
Phone: (844) 942-4448
Fax: (844) 424-4484
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Haggith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 09 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Haggith ( CPSO# 95517 )

Business Address:
30 Prospect Street
Suite 302
Newmarket ON  L3Y 3S9
Phone Number: (844) 942-4448

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YEVGENIYA HAGGITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAGGITH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2016