Hahn, Angelika Freya Gabriele (CPSO#: 30371)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Aug 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Aug 1978

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:Ludwig Maximilian University at Munich, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 29 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANGELIKA FREYA GABRIELE HAHN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAHN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1978