Hahn, Ernest Michael (CPSO#: 50661)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 May 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Centre
Suite 307
430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone: (519) 893-5568
Fax: (519) 893-5795
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ernest M. Hahn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Hahn ( CPSO# 50661 )

Business Address:
307 - 430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone Number: (519) 893-5568

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1985 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERNEST MICHAEL HAHN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAHN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 1984