Hahn, Miah (CPSO#: 59311)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 25 Jan 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rouge Valley Health System
Suite 101 The Court
2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 5E9
Phone: (416) 283-2311
Fax: (416) 284-1218
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Miah Hahn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hahn ( CPSO# 59311 )

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Health System
Suite 101 The Court
2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 5E9
Phone Number: (416) 283-2311

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 1989
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 25 Jan 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 25 Jan 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from January 25, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Miah Hahn, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Hahn to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")

                                                  of

                                             DR. MIAH HAHN
                                             ("Dr. Hahn")

                                                  to 

                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Hahn, certificate of registration number 59311, am a member of the
                  College.  The College has received information regarding my standard of
                  practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Hahn, acknowledge that the College initiated an investigation
                  bearing File Number 7214935 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged
                  in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my pediatric
                  orthopedic surgery practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Hahn, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (5)   Practice Restriction

                  (a)   I, Dr. Hahn, undertake that I will not engage in any of the
                        following areas of practice:
                  
                        (i)   Operative treatment of children for Developmental Dysplasia
                              of the Hip ("DDH surgery").
                  
            (6)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Hahn, undertake to practise under the guidance of a clinical
                        supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for twelve (12) months ("Clinical Supervision").
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Hahn, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s).  The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP") attached as Appendix
                              "B";
                  
                        (ii)  High-level supervision: For a period of four (4) weeks, the
                              Clinical Supervisor will engage in a period of high-level
                              supervision, during which time:
                  
                              i.    I shall not be the Most Responsible Physician ("MRP")
                                    for any patient; and
                  
                              ii.   the Clinical Supervisor will directly observe my
                                    performance of all procedures.
                  
                        (iii) The Clinical Supervisor shall reconsider the need for
                              high-level supervision after the first four (4) weeks of my
                              Clinical Supervision, and at the beginning of every month
                              thereafter for so long as the period of moderate supervision
                              continues.  If the Clinical Supervisor believes that I am
                              ready to practise under moderate supervision, he/she shall
                              provide the College with a report addressing the practise
                              concerns raised in the report of the Medical Inspector,
                              received July 27, 2016.  The College must agree to the
                              transition to the next phase, based on the reports of the
                              Clinical Supervisor;
                  
                        (iv)  Moderate-level supervision: For a period of a further eleven
                              (11) months, the Clinical Supervisor will engage in a period
                              of moderate-level supervision, during which time the Clinical
                              Supervisor will meet with me at my Practice Location, or
                              another location approved by the College, on a monthly basis
                              to;
                  
                              i.    review a minimum of fifteen (15) to twenty (20) of my
                                    patient records and discuss any issues or concerns
                                    arising therefrom; and
                  
                              ii.   discuss any concerns the Clinical Supervisor may have
                                    arising from the chart reviews or the direct
                                    observations.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Hahn, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be selected
                        by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the educational needs
                        identified in the IEP set out at Appendix "B" to my Undertaking, as
                        well as the areas of concern identified in the report of the
                        Medical Inspector, received July 27, 2016, and concerns that may
                        arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Hahn, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Hahn, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Hahn, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Hahn, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (6)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Hahn, agree that if I am required to cease practise as a
                        result of section (6)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (7)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Hahn, undertake to participate in and successfully complete
                        all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B",
                        including all of the following professional education (the
                        "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   ProBE: Ethics & Boundaries Program - Canada;
                  
                        (ii)  Individualized one-on-one instruction satisfactory to the
                              College, with respect to the issues of concern raised in the
                              report of the Medical Inspector, received July 27, 2016, with
                              an instructor selected by the College; and
                  
                        (iii) any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Hahn, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it.  I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Hahn, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Hahn, undertake to complete this requirement by within three
                        months of executing this undertaking, or, if no satisfactory
                        program is available by that time, by the first possible
                        opportunity thereafter.
                  
            (8)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Hahn, undertake that, approximately three (3) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (3)
                        above and Appendix "A" attached, I will submit to a Reassessment of
                        my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors
                        selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I acknowledge and
                        agree that the Reassessment may include a chart review, direct
                        observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and co-workers,
                        feedback from patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the
                        College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Hahn, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking, and to abide by those
                        recommendations of the Assessor(s) that are approved by the ICR
                        Committee.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Hahn, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical Supervisor(s)
                        may receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may
                        discuss with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from
                        the Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Hahn, understand and agree that if I am of the view that any
                        of the Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will have
                        thirty (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations within
                        which to provide the College with my submissions in this regard.  I
                        further understand and agree that thereafter, the ICR Committee
                        will consider my submissions and make a determination regarding
                        whether or not the recommendations, or any of them, are reasonable
                        and if so, whether they, or any of them, constitute limitations or
                        restrictions on my practice, and that decision will be provided to
                        me.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Hahn, undertake that, following the decision referenced in
                        section (8)(d) above, I will abide by those recommendations of the
                        Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are reasonable. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Hahn, hereby consent to any of the following being included
                        on the public register as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                        certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23 of the
                        Code: 
                  
                        (i)   any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which are terms,
                              conditions or limitations on my practice;  
                  
                        (ii)  any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which the ICR
                              Committee has identified in its decision referenced in
                              section (8)(d) as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                              practice.
                  
            (9)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Hahn, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Hahn, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Hahn, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Hahn, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form(s), attached hereto as Appendix "C". 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (10)  I, Dr. Hahn, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Hahn, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible
                  for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (12)  I, Dr. Hahn, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.
            (13)  I, Dr. Hahn, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (14)  I, Dr. Hahn, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (15)  I, Dr. Hahn, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (16)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Hahn, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Hahn, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Dr. Hahn was the subject of a College investigation into
                              whether she engaged in professional misconduct and/or is
                              incompetent in her pediatric orthopedic surgery practice.  As
                              a result of the investigation:
                  
                              *     Dr. Hahn will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                                    Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12 months. 
                              *     Dr. Hahn will engage in professional education in
                                    ethics and boundaries, and areas of clinical concern.
                              *     Dr. Hahn's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                                    selected by the College within 3 months of the end of
                                    the period of Clinical Supervision.
            D.    CONSENT

            (17)  I, Dr. Hahn, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the professional education set
                  out in section (6) above and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or
                  Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (18)  I, Dr. Hahn, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (19)  I, Dr. Hahn, give my irrevocable consent to any person who facilitates my
                  completion of the professional education set out in section (6) above,
                  and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;

                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  (e)   which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                        professional education set out in section (6) above and which he or
                        she reasonably believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my
                        patients.
                  

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: March 17, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: Member
Active Date: January 25, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Miah Hahn to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective January 25, 2017:

Dr. Hahn was the subject of a College investigation into whether she engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in her pediatric orthopedic surgery practice. As a result of the investigation:

• Dr. Hahn will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12 months.
• Dr. Hahn will engage in professional education in ethics and boundaries, and areas of clinical concern.
• Dr. Hahn’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 3 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.