Haidar, Mona Hussein (CPSO#: 109160)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 23 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:American University of Beirut, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Phone: (416) 978-6976
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Najib Safieddine Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 26 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Safieddine ( CPSO# 77567 )
Dr. M. Haidar ( CPSO# 109160)

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Chest Centre (G2)
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-2345

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MONA HUSSEIN HAIDAR shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. HAIDAR is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. HAIDAR shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. HAIDAR is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. HAIDAR shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. HAIDAR is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. HAIDAR no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 22 Sep 2016
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018