Haider, Atika (CPSO#: 95297)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Feb 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Feb 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Ziauddin Medical University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit. 201
222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone: (905)419-8000
Fax: (905) 623-0057
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

12637 Tenth Line
Stouffville ON  L4A7X3
Canada
Phone: 9055916060
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Atika Haider Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Haider ( CPSO# 95297 )

Business Address:
Unit 201
222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone Number: (905) 419-8000

Business Address:
12637 Tenth Line
Stouffville ON  L4A 7X3
Phone Number: (905) 591-6060

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Pakistan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ATIKA HAIDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAIDER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 13 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jan 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 09 Feb 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2015