Haider, Erum (CPSO#: 87463)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Dow Medical College, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Health Centre
Unit # 18 - 1615 Dundas Street
Whitby ON  L1N 2L1
Phone: (905) 240-2880
Fax: (905) 240-3880
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr.Erum Haider Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Haider ( CPSO# 87463 )

Business Address:
Medical Health Centre
Unit #18 - 1615 Dundas Street East
Whitby ON  L1N 2L1
Phone Number: (905) 240-2880

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Pakistan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Jul 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERUM HAIDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAIDER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2007 to 23 Oct 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 24 Oct 2007 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2008 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2009