Haider, Shariq (CPSO#: 69029)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Aug 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Aug 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Hospital
A3-79
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 389-4411 Ext. 43251
Fax: (905) 389-0108
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Haider Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 18 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Haider ( CPSO# 69029 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital
Room A3-79
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation,St. Peter's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 05 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHARIQ HAIDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAIDER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Aug 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 1999