Haig, Aaron Robert (CPSO#: 79504)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Oct 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Campus Site
Department of Pathology
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 4G5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 36365
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AARON ROBERT HAIG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAIG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2008