Haig, Sara Lynn (CPSO#: 80722)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: Graydon, Sara Lynn (used until: 26 Aug 2009 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6330
Fax: (519) 646-6407
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 14 Oct 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARA LYNN HAIG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAIG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2010