Haight, James Stratford Jackson (CPSO#: 27978)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Dec 1975

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German, Italian

Education:Oxford University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Albany Clinic
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4H 2P8
Phone: (416) 461-9471
Fax: (416) 461-2710
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

491 Eglinton Avenue West #101
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Canada
Phone: (416) 787-5511
Fax: (416) 787-1592
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

2 Champagne Drive
Toronto ON  M3J 2C5
Canada
Phone: (416) 677-1101
Fax: (416) 981-3005
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. James Haight Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Haight ( CPSO# 27978 )

Business Address:
101 - 491 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Phone Number: (416) 787-4333

Business Address:
2 Champagne Drive
Toronto ON  M3J 2C5
Phone Number: (416) 645-5668

Business Address:
Albany Clinic
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4H 2P8
Phone Number: (416) 461-9471

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 27 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES STRATFORD JACKSON HAIGHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAIGHT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 1975
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2011